NCERT Class 6 Math Exercise 2.3 Solution of Chapter 2 Whole Numbers with explanation. Here we provide Class 6 Maths all Chapters in Hindi for cbse, HBSE, Mp Board, UP Board and some other boards.

**Also Read : – Class 6 Maths NCERT Solution**

NCERT Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3 Solution in english Medium.

**Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Exercise 2.3 Solution**

**Q.1 Which of the following will not represent zero:**

**A. 1 + 0**

**Ans.** = 1

Therefore it does not represent zero.

**B. 0*0**

**Ans.** = 0

Therefore it represents zero.

**C. 0/2**

**Ans.** = 0

Therefore it represents zero.

**D. (10 – 10)/2**

**Ans**. = 0

Therefore it represents zero.

**Q.2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples .**

**Ans.** Yes. If product of two whole numbers is zero. Then we can say that one or both of them will be zero.

eg. 0*1 = 0
0*0 = 0

0*15 = 0

**Q.3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1 ? Justify through examples.**

**Ans.** Both of them will be one to obtain product of two whole numbers to 1.

eg. 1*1 = 1

**Q.4. FInd using distributive property:**

**A. 728 x 101**

**Ans.** = 728 ( 100 + 1 )

= 728 x 100 + 728 x 1

= 72800 + 728

= 73,528

**B. 5437 x 1001**

**Ans.** = 5437 ( 1000 + 1 )

= 5437 x 1000 + 5437 x 1

= 5437000 + 5437

= 54,27,900

**C. 824 x 25**

**Ans.** = 824 ( 20 + 5 )

= 824 x 20 + 824 x 5

= 16480 + 4120

= 20,600

**D. 4275 x 125**

**Ans.** = 4275 ( 100 + 25 )

= 4275 x 100 + 4275 x 25

= 427500 + 4275 ( 20 + 5 )

= 427500 + 4275 x 20 + 4275 x 5

= 4,27,500 + 85,440 + 21,375

= 5,34,375

**E. 504 x 35**

**Ans.** = ( 500 + 4 ) x 35

= 500 x 35 + 35 x 4

= 17500 + 140

= 17,640

**Q.5. Study the pattern:**

**1 x 8 + 1 = 9**

**12 x 8 + 2 = 98**

**123 x 8 + 3 = 987**

**1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876**

**12345 x 8 + 5 98765**

**Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern work?**

**Ans.** Next two steps of the pattern:

123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543